ND HB1205 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-25 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 47 nays 46
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-25 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 47 nays 46
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 15-10-18.2 and section 15-10-18.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to tuition reduction for dependents of disabled veterans based on disability ratings.
Title
Tuition reduction for dependents of disabled veterans based on disability ratings.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Schatz [R] | Rep. Alan Fehr [R] | Rep. Bob Hunskor [D] | Sen. Howard Anderson [R] |
Sen. Jim Dotzenrod [D] | Sen. Donald Schaible [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 47 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-25 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 47 nays 46 |
2015-02-24 | House | Amendment adopted |
2015-02-24 | House | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 12 11 0 |
2015-01-28 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2015-01-21 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2015-01-12 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |