ND HB1234 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-01 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 21 nays 71
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-01 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 21 nays 71
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 57-38 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to income tax withholding for oil and gas royalties; to amend and reenact section 15-05-10, subsection 4 of section 38-08-04, sections 57-51.1-01, 57-51.1-02, and 57-51.1-03, subsection 1 of section 57-51.1-03.1, and section 57-51.2-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to oil extraction tax definitions, rates, and exemptions and the state-tribal oil tax agreement; to provide for a study; and to provide an effective date.
Title
Oil extraction tax definitions, rates, and exemptions and the state-tribal oil tax agreement; to provide for a study; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-01 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 21 nays 71 |
2013-05-01 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-05-01 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2013-04-19 | House | Appoint Rep. Headland to replace Rep. Belter on conference committee |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Cook Miller Triplett |
2013-04-17 | House | Conference committee appointed Belter Drovdal S. Kelsh |
2013-04-17 | House | Refused to concur |
2013-04-12 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-02-25 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 72 nays 21 |
2013-02-25 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-02-22 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 3 1 |
2013-02-04 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |