ND HB1241 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 38-11.1 and section 38-11.1-04.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to notice of oil and gas drilling operations and compensation for loss of agricultural production and income caused by oil and gas production; to amend and reenact sections 38-11.1-02, 38-11.1-04, 38-11.1-08, and 47-16-39.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to damage and disruption payments for damages caused by oil and gas production, agreement with offer of settlement, and the obligation to pay oil and gas royalties; to repeal section 38-11.1-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to notice of oil and gas drilling operations; and to provide an effective date.
Title
Notice of oil and gas drilling operations; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. John Andrist [R] | Rep. David Drovdal [R] | Rep. Keith Kempenich [R] | Rep. Vicky Steiner [R] |
Sen. Rich Wardner [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-26 | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/25 | |
2011-04-25 | Signed by Governor 04/25 | |
2011-04-22 | Signed by Speaker | |
2011-04-07 | Signed by President | |
2011-04-05 | Concurred | |
2011-03-24 | Returned to House (12) | |
2011-03-23 | Reconsidered | |
2011-03-22 | Amendment proposed on floor | |
2011-03-21 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-03-18 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 1 | |
2011-03-10 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-02-22 | Introduced, first reading, referred Natural Resources Committee | |
2011-02-18 | Received from House | |
2011-02-17 | Second reading, passed, yeas 94 nays 0 | |
2011-02-15 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-02-14 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 2 | |
2011-01-27 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-01-10 | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |