ND HB1249 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-14 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-14 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact chapter 15.1-39 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to requiring schools to designate their athletic teams and sports for male, female, or coed participation and limitations on use of governmental property for athletic events.
Title
Requiring schools to designate their athletic teams and sports for male, female, or coed participation and limitations on use of governmental property for athletic events.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 78 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 78 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-14 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/12 |
2023-04-12 | House | Signed by Governor 04/11 |
2023-04-06 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-04-03 | House | Returned to House |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 38 nays 9 |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 1 0 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:38 |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:30 |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Request return from committee |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Education |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-02-15 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 78 nays 15 |
2023-02-14 | House | Laid over one legislative day |
2023-02-14 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-02-13 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 3 0 |
2023-02-07 | House | Committee Hearing 10:16 |
2023-01-31 | House | Committee Hearing 03:45 |
2023-01-24 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-01-10 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Human Services |