ND HB1250 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-03 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 031 nays 062
Status: Introduced on January 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-03 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 031 nays 062
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Andrist, Christmann A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 15-69 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a department of commerce report to the legislative council on the tax impact of the centers of excellence program; and to provide an expiration date.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Andrist, Christmann A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 15-69 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a department of commerce report to the legislative council on the tax impact of the centers of excellence program; and to provide an expiration date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-03 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 031 nays 062 | |
2009-01-29 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 009 n 004 | |
2009-01-19 | Committee Hearing 11:00 | |
2009-01-09 | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1250.html |