ND HB1265 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Signed by Governor 03/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Signed by Governor 03/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study of state parks.
Title
AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study of state parks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 39 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 70 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 70 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | House | Signed by Governor 03/21 |
2019-03-20 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-18 | House | Returned to House |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 39 nays 6 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 1 0 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:45 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-01-23 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 70 nays 21 |
2019-01-21 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-01-18 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 8 5 1 |
2019-01-17 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |