ND HB1272 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-30 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 6 nays 41
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-30 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 6 nays 41
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide for a report to the legislative management regarding medical psychologist licensure; and to provide an appropriation.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide for a report to the legislative management regarding medical psychologist licensure; and to provide an appropriation.
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Fehr [R] | Rep. Dick Anderson [R] | Rep. Curt Hofstad [R] | Rep. Mike Lefor [R] |
Sen. Judy Lee [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 6 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 64 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 64 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 6 nays 41 |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 2 0 |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Received from House |
2015-02-25 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 64 nays 28 |
2015-02-24 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-02-23 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 1 0 |
2015-01-28 | House | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2015-01-13 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |