ND HB1275 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Signed by Governor 04/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Signed by Governor 04/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 15.1-19-03.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the recitation of prayer at activities for public and nonpublic schools.
Title
The recitation of prayer at activities for public and nonpublic schools.
Sponsors
Rep. Kim Koppelman [R] | Rep. Charles Damschen [R] | Rep. James Kasper [R] | Rep. David Monson [R] |
Rep. Dan Ruby [R] | Rep. Donald Vigesaa [R] | Sen. Robert Erbele [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 80 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 80 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-25 | House | Signed by Governor 04/24 |
2017-04-24 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2017-04-20 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 3 |
2017-04-20 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2017-04-20 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Appoint Sen. Oban to replace Sen. Schaible on conference committee |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Appoint Sen. Schaible to replace Sen. Davison on conference committee |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Davison Schaible Kannianen |
2017-04-10 | House | Conference committee appointed Karls K. Koppelman Simons |
2017-04-10 | House | Refused to concur |
2017-04-03 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 43 nays 1 |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:30 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-02-15 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 80 nays 10 |
2017-02-09 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-08 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 2 0 |
2017-01-25 | House | Committee Hearing 10:50 |
2017-01-12 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2017-01-12 | House | Request return from committee |
2017-01-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |