ND HB1304 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 12 nays 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 12 nays 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 62.1-03-01 and section 62.1-03-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to carrying a handgun; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Carrying a handgun; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 12 N: 82 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 12 nays 82 |
2021-02-19 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 13 1 0 |
2021-01-22 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |