ND HB1330 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-18 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 19 nays 75
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-18 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 19 nays 75
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new chapter to title 51 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to prohibiting covered entities from selling users' protected data without consent; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Prohibiting covered entities from selling users' protected data without consent; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 19 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-18 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 19 nays 75 |
2021-02-10 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 12 1 1 |
2021-02-09 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2021-01-13 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |