ND HB1340 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 37 nays 56
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 37 nays 56
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 29-29 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to prohibiting entry onto private property without permission.
Title
Prohibiting entry onto private property without permission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 37 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-23 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 37 nays 56 |
2021-02-17 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-16 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 8 5 1 |
2021-02-15 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2021-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |