ND HB1435 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Signed by Governor 04/25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Signed by Governor 04/25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 37-17.3-02, 37-17.3-02.2, and 37-17.3-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, and section 10 of chapter 247 of the 2017 Session Laws, relating to the governance, purchase, financing, and operation of the statewide interoperable radio network; to provide for a legislative management study; to provide an appropriation; to provide for a transfer; and to declare an emergency.
Title
The governance, purchase, financing, and operation of the statewide interoperable radio network; to provide for a legislative management study; to provide an appropriation; to provide for a transfer; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Glenn Bosch [R] | Rep. Patrick Heinert [R] | Rep. Mike Nathe [R] | Rep. Todd Porter [R] |
Sen. Dwight Cook [R] | Sen. Donald Schaible [R] | Sen. Rich Wardner [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | House | Signed by Governor 04/25 |
2019-04-23 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2019-04-19 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 86 nays 6, Emergency clause carried |
2019-04-19 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Davison K. Roers Oban |
2019-04-09 | House | Conference committee appointed Kasper B. Koppelman Brandenburg |
2019-04-09 | House | Refused to concur |
2019-04-01 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on table |
2019-02-20 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 85 nays 5, Emergency clause carried |
2019-02-19 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-18 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 19 1 1 |
2019-02-12 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2019-02-12 | House | Amendment adopted |
2019-02-11 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 1 0 |
2019-02-07 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |