ND HB1454 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 8 nays 86
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 8 nays 86
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 51-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to unlawful interference with business relation; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Unlawful interference with business relation; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Kading [R] | Rep. Rick Becker [R] | Rep. Cole Christensen [R] | Sen. Bob Paulson [R] |
Rep. Gary Paur [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 8 N: 86 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-23 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 8 nays 86 |
2021-02-17 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 3 0 |
2021-02-10 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-01-18 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |