ND HB1474 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 1-01-49, subsection 3 of section 12.1-36.1-01 of the North Dakota Century Code as created by section 1 of House Bill No. 1254, as approved by the sixty-eighth legislative assembly, subsection 2 of section 15-10.6-01 of the North Dakota Century Code as created by section 1 of House Bill No. 1489, as approved by the sixty-eighth legislative assembly, subsection 2 of section 15.1-41-01 of the North Dakota Century Code as created by section 1 of House Bill No. 1249, as approved by the sixty-eighth legislative assembly, subsection 20 of section 23-02.1-01 of the North Dakota Century Code as amended in section 1 of House Bill No. 1139, as approved by the sixty-eighth legislative assembly, and subsection 7 of section 51-35-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the definition of female, male, sex, and scrap metal dealer.
Title
The definition of female, male, sex, and scrap metal dealer.
Sponsors
Rep. SuAnn Olson [R] | Rep. Dick Anderson [R] | Rep. Cole Christensen [R] | Rep. James Kasper [R] |
Rep. Ben Koppelman [R] | Rep. Brandon Prichard [R] | Rep. Vicky Steiner [R] | Sen. Keith Boehm [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 75 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 74 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 75 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 74 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-18 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 05/09 |
2023-05-18 | House | Signed by Governor 05/08 |
2023-04-28 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 42 nays 4 |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2023-04-25 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 75 nays 15 |
2023-04-25 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2023-04-25 | House | Reconsidered |
2023-04-25 | House | Conference committee report rejected |
2023-04-24 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee appointed K. Roers Cleary Hogan |
2023-04-20 | House | Conference committee appointed Rohr Frelich Davis |
2023-04-20 | House | Refused to concur |
2023-04-03 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 35 nays 12 |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Reported back amended, without recommendation 5 1 0 |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:40 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Human Services |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-02-17 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 74 nays 18 |
2023-02-17 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-02-16 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 2 0 |
2023-02-15 | House | Committee Hearing 05:00 |
2023-01-25 | House | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2023-01-18 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Human Services |