ND HCR3023 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-08 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-08 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to study the feasibility and desirability of creating and encouraging the use of paved bike paths throughout the state.
Title
A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to study the feasibility and desirability of creating and encouraging the use of paved bike paths throughout the state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-08 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/08 |
2013-04-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-03-27 | House | Returned to House |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Second reading, adopted |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-02-21 | House | Second reading, adopted |
2013-02-08 | House | Reported back, do pass, placed on consent calendar 12 0 2 |
2013-02-08 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2013-01-29 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |