ND SB2009 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the state fair association.
Title
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the state fair association.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/12 |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2021-04-06 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 86 nays 7 |
2021-03-31 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 17 3 1 |
2021-03-03 | House | Committee Hearing 02:15 |
2021-02-19 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 01:30 |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |