ND SB2023 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Signed by Governor 04/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Signed by Governor 04/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the North Dakota racing commission; to provide for a legislative management study; and to provide for a report.
Title
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the North Dakota racing commission; to provide for a legislative management study; and to provide for a report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House Second reading (Y: 64 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House Second reading (Y: 64 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/16 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 32 nays 15 |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Concurred |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2021-04-05 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 64 nays 30 |
2021-04-01 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-03-31 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 16 3 2 |
2021-03-22 | House | Committee Hearing 02:45 |
2021-03-04 | House | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2021-02-18 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-15 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 30 nays 17 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2021-01-07 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |