ND SB2033 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Signed by Governor 03/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Signed by Governor 03/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
(Information Technology Committee) AN ACT to amend and reenact section 54-35-15.2, subsection 8 of section 54-59-05, and section 54-59-23 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the definition of a large information technology project.
Title
The definition of a large information technology project.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/19 |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-03-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2013-03-13 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 94 nays 0 |
2013-03-12 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 21 0 1 |
2013-03-12 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-02-15 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
2013-01-23 | House | Received from Senate |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2013-01-11 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |