ND SB2065 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Signed by Governor 04/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Signed by Governor 04/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact chapter 38-25 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the jurisdiction of the industrial commission to regulate the permitting and amalgamation of the underground storage of oil or gas; and to amend and reenact sections 15-05-09 and 15-05-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to oil and gas leases and royalties from oil leases.
Title
Oil and gas leases and royalties from oil leases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Second reading (Y: 72 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Second reading (Y: 72 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/19 |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 35 nays 12 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Concurred |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2021-04-07 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 72 nays 19 |
2021-04-06 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-04-05 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 1 0 |
2021-03-04 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2021-02-09 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 40 nays 7 |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 1 0 |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |