ND SB2103 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Signed by Governor 04/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Signed by Governor 04/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact section 13-04.1-09.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to money broker charges; to amend and reenact sections 13-04.1-02.1, 13-05-02.3, and 13-08-12 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to money broker exemptions, collection agency exemptions, and deferred presentment service transaction procedures; to repeal section 13-04.1-09.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to money broker charges; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Money broker charges; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 18 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-01-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 18 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-01-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/16 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Concurred |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2021-03-24 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 91 nays 3 |
2021-03-22 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-03-19 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2 |
2021-03-17 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-02-19 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2021-01-11 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |