ND SB2162 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 50-06 and two new sections to chapter 50-11.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to criminal history record checks and to self-declaration of an individual who provides early childhood services; to amend and reenact subdivision g of subsection 2 of section 12-60-24 and sections 50-11.1-02, 50-11.1-02.1, 50-11.1-03, 50-11.1-04, 50-11.1-06, 50-11.1-06.1, 50-11.1-06.2, 50-11.1-07, 50-11.1-07.1, 50-11.1-07.2, 50-11.1-07.3, 50-11.1-07.4, 50-11.1-07.5, 50-11.1-07.6, 50-11.1-07.8, 50-11.1-08, 50-11.1-09, 50-11.1-10, 50-11.1-11, 50-11.1-11.1, 50-11.1-12, and 50-11.1-13.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to criminal history record checks, licensing and registration of early childhood services providers, investigation of early childhood services providers, denial or revocation of request for early childhood services provider licensure or registration, and resource and referral services; to repeal section 50-11.1-03.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to cardiopulmonary resuscitation certification for a family child care home operator; to provide a statement of legislative intent; to provide a penalty; to provide an appropriation; and to provide an expiration date.
Title
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 50-06 and two new sections to chapter 50-11.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to criminal history record checks and to self-declaration of an individual who provides early childhood services; to amend and reenact subdivision g of subsection 2 of section 12-60-24 and sections 50-11.1-02, 50-11.1-02.1, 50-11.1-03, 50-11.1-04, 50-11.1-06, 50-11.1-06.1, 50-11.1-06.2, 50-11.1-07, 50-11.1-07.1, 50-11.1-07.2, 50-11.1-07.3, 50-11.1-07.4, 50-11.1-07.5, 50-11.1-07.6, 50-11.1-07.8, 50-11.1-08, 50-11.1-09, 50-11.1-10, 50-11.1-11, 50-11.1-11.1, 50-11.1-12, and 50-11.1-13.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to criminal history record checks, licensing and registration of early childhood services providers, investigation of early childhood services providers, denial or revocation of request for early childhood services provider licensure or registration, and resource and referral services; to repeal section 50-11.1-03.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to cardiopulmonary resuscitation certification for a family child care home operator; to provide a statement of legislative intent; to provide a penalty; to provide an appropriation; and to provide an expiration date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-19 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-05-19 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-05-05 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-05-04 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-05-04 | Signed by President | |
2009-05-02 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 071 nays 020 | |
2009-05-02 | Reconsidered | |
2009-05-01 | Requested Senate to return | |
2009-05-01 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 046 nays 047 | |
2009-05-01 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-30 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (House recede) | |
2009-04-30 | Second reading, passed, yeas 045 nays 002 | |
2009-04-30 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-30 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (House recede) | |
2009-04-20 | Conf comm appointed Weisz Porter Conrad | |
2009-04-16 | Conf comm appointed Dever Erbele Pomeroy | |
2009-04-16 | Refused to concur | |
2009-04-10 | Returned to Senate (12) | |
2009-04-10 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 062 nays 029 | |
2009-04-08 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-04-07 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 013 n 000 | |
2009-03-03 | Committee Hearing 10:00 | |
2009-02-17 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services | |
2009-02-13 | Received from Senate | |
2009-02-12 | Second reading, passed, yeas 037 nays 010 | |
2009-02-10 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 009 n 004 | |
2009-01-29 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2009-01-23 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-01-23 | Amendment adopted | |
2009-01-22 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 006 n 000 | |
2009-01-13 | Committee Hearing 10:30 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2162.html |