ND SB2245 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-27 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 44
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-27 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 44
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 13 of section 53-06.1-01, subsection 3 of section 53-06.1-10.1, and subsections 2 and 5 of section 53-06.1-11 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a manufacturer of an electronic device, electronic fifty-fifty raffle tickets, allowable expenses, and monthly rent for electronic pull tab devices.
Title
A manufacturer of an electronic device, electronic fifty-fifty raffle tickets, allowable expenses, and monthly rent for electronic pull tab devices.
Sponsors
Sen. Larry Luick [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 2 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-03-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 52 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 52 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-27 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 44 |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate accede) |
2023-04-20 | House | Conference committee appointed Dockter Toman Koppelman |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Luick Braunberger Paulson |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2023-03-23 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 52 nays 38 |
2023-03-22 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-03-21 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 1 0 |
2023-03-21 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-03-15 | House | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2023-03-08 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2023-02-17 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Finance and Taxation |
2023-02-10 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:15 |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:30 |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2023-01-13 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Judiciary |