ND SB2257 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-21 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 9 nays 36
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-21 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 9 nays 36
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subdivision a of subsection 1 of section 40-47-01.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to extraterritorial zoning.
Title
Extraterritorial zoning.
Sponsors
Sen. Jordan Kannianen [R] | Sen. Diane Larson [R] | Sen. Nicole Poolman [R] | Rep. Sebastian Ertelt [R] |
Rep. Patrick Heinert [R] | Rep. Donald Longmuir [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 9 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 9 nays 36 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Reported back without recommendation 6 0 0 |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |