ND SB2311 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-12 - Signed by Governor 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-12 - Signed by Governor 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide for a Bank of North Dakota letter of credit.
Title
AN ACT to provide for a Bank of North Dakota letter of credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/12 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-07 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2017-04-06 | House | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate accede) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate accede) |
2017-04-03 | House | Conference committee appointed D. Ruby Louser Boschee |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Roers Campbell Marcellais |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2017-03-27 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 92 nays 0 |
2017-03-23 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-22 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2 |
2017-03-13 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |