ND SCR4020 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-24 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-24 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution urging Congress to establish food labeling standards, direct the clarification of voluntary food labeling standards, and provide for a review of foods derived through the use of biotechnology.
Title
A concurrent resolution urging Congress to establish food labeling standards, direct the clarification of voluntary food labeling standards, and provide for a review of foods derived through the use of biotechnology.
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Miller [R] | Sen. Jerry Klein [R] | Sen. Terry Wanzek [R] | Rep. Craig Headland [R] |
Rep. Dennis Johnson [R] | Rep. Marvin Nelson [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-19 - House - House Second reading, adopted (Y: 78 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary Of State 03/24 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2015-03-19 | House | Second reading, adopted yeas 78 nays 10 |
2015-03-17 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 1 1 |
2015-03-13 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2015-02-25 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |
2015-02-24 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Second reading, adopted |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |