NE LB1402 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by Governor on April 24, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by Governor on April 24, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Require the State Treasurer to establish education scholarships and eliminate the Opportunity Scholarships Act
Title
Require the State Treasurer to establish education scholarships and eliminate the Opportunity Scholarships Act
Sponsors
Sen. Lou Linehan [N] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-18 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause stricken 32-14-3 (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Legislature - Failed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 32-15-2 (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Legislature - DeBoer MO1388 failed (Y: 12 N: 33 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-18 - Legislature - Linehan MO1418 prevailed (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment (Y: 30 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Legislature - DeBoer MO1387 failed (Y: 8 N: 33 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-04-10 - Legislature - Linehan MO1414 adopted (Y: 33 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 31 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Legislature - Appropriations AM2679 adopted (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 15 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Legislature - Linehan AM3431 adopted (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 15 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Legislature - Linehan MO1410 prevailed (Y: 33 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Legislature - Linehan MO1188 failed (Y: 7 N: 34 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-04-09 - Legislature - Cavanaugh, M. MO1384 failed (Y: 4 N: 31 NV: 12 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-04-09 - Legislature - Linehan MO1187 failed (Y: 3 N: 33 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-04-09 - Legislature - Cavanaugh, M. MO1383 failed (Y: 7 N: 30 NV: 11 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-04-18 - Legislature - Failed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 32-15-2 (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Legislature - DeBoer MO1388 failed (Y: 12 N: 33 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-18 - Legislature - Linehan MO1418 prevailed (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment (Y: 30 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Legislature - DeBoer MO1387 failed (Y: 8 N: 33 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-04-10 - Legislature - Linehan MO1414 adopted (Y: 33 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 31 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Legislature - Appropriations AM2679 adopted (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 15 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Legislature - Linehan AM3431 adopted (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 15 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Legislature - Linehan MO1410 prevailed (Y: 33 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Legislature - Linehan MO1188 failed (Y: 7 N: 34 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-04-09 - Legislature - Cavanaugh, M. MO1384 failed (Y: 4 N: 31 NV: 12 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-04-09 - Legislature - Linehan MO1187 failed (Y: 3 N: 33 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-04-09 - Legislature - Cavanaugh, M. MO1383 failed (Y: 7 N: 30 NV: 11 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 24, 2024 |
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 18, 2024 |
2024-04-18 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Correctly enrolled |
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause stricken 32-14-3 |
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Failed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 32-15-2 |
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2024-04-18 | Legislature | DeBoer AM3459 not considered |
2024-04-18 | Legislature | DeBoer AM3476 not considered |
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. FA422 not considered |
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. FA421 not considered |
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Linehan FA224 not considered |
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Linehan FA223 not considered |
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Linehan FA222 not considered |
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Linehan FA221 not considered |
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Linehan FA220 not considered |
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Linehan AM2590 not considered |
2024-04-18 | Legislature | DeBoer MO1389 not considered |
2024-04-18 | Legislature | DeBoer MO1388 failed |
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Linehan MO1418 prevailed |
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Linehan MO1418 Invoke cloture pursuant to Rule 7, Sec. 10 filed |
2024-04-10 | Legislature | DeBoer AM3459 to AM3431 filed |
2024-04-10 | Legislature | DeBoer AM3476 to AM3431 filed |
2024-04-10 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2024-04-10 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2024-04-10 | Legislature | DeBoer MO1387 failed |
2024-04-10 | Legislature | Linehan MO1414 prevailed |
2024-04-10 | Legislature | Linehan MO1414 Invoke cloture pursuant to Rule 7, Sec. 10 filed |
2024-04-10 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER135 adopted |
2024-04-10 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER135 filed |
2024-04-10 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER135 |
2024-04-09 | Legislature | DeBoer MO1389 Indefinitely postpone filed |
2024-04-09 | Legislature | DeBoer MO1388 Recommit to the Appropriations Committee filed |
2024-04-09 | Legislature | DeBoer MO1387 Bracket until April 18, 2024 filed |
2024-04-09 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. FA422 filed |
2024-04-09 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. FA421 to AM2679 filed |
2024-04-09 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2024-04-09 | Legislature | Appropriations AM2679 adopted |
2024-04-09 | Legislature | Linehan AM3431 adopted |
2024-04-09 | Legislature | Linehan MO1410 prevailed |
2024-04-09 | Legislature | Linehan MO1410 Invoke cloture pursuant to Rule 7, Sec. 10 filed |
2024-04-09 | Legislature | Linehan AM3431 to AM2679 filed |
2024-04-09 | Legislature | Linehan AM3016 withdrawn |
2024-04-09 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO1385 withdrawn |
2024-04-09 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO1385 Reconsider the vote taken on MO1188 filed |
2024-04-09 | Legislature | Linehan MO1188 failed |
2024-04-09 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO1384 failed |
2024-04-09 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO1384 Reconsider the vote taken on MO1187 filed |
2024-04-09 | Legislature | Linehan MO1187 failed |
2024-04-09 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO1383 failed |
2024-04-09 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO1383 Reconsider the vote taken on MO1186 filed |
2024-04-09 | Legislature | Linehan MO1186 failed |
2024-03-27 | Legislature | Slama name added |
2024-03-25 | Legislature | Linehan AM3016 to AM2679 filed |
2024-02-23 | Legislature | Appropriations AM2679 filed |
2024-02-23 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2679 |
2024-02-20 | Legislature | Linehan MO1188 Recommit to the Appropriations Committee filed |
2024-02-20 | Legislature | Linehan MO1187 Bracket until April 18, 2024 filed |
2024-02-20 | Legislature | Linehan MO1186 Indefinitely postpone pursuant to Rule 6, Sec. 3(f) filed |
2024-02-20 | Legislature | Linehan AM2590 filed |
2024-02-20 | Legislature | Linehan FA224 filed |
2024-02-20 | Legislature | Linehan FA223 filed |
2024-02-20 | Legislature | Linehan FA222 filed |
2024-02-20 | Legislature | Linehan FA221 filed |
2024-02-20 | Legislature | Linehan FA220 filed |
2024-02-15 | Legislature | Linehan priority bill |
2024-01-24 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 06, 2024 |
2024-01-18 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2024-01-17 | Legislature | Date of introduction |