NE LB159 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB159 amended into LB867 by AM2011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB159 amended into LB867 by AM2011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide and change sales tax provisions relating to gold, silver, and platinum and provide a tax amnesty
Title
Provide and change sales tax provisions relating to gold, silver, and platinum and provide a tax amnesty
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB159 amended into LB867 by AM2011 |
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2014-02-21 | Legislature | Revenue AM1579 filed |
2014-02-21 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1579 |
2014-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill. |
2013-02-06 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 14, 2013 |
2013-01-16 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2013-01-14 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=18024 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB159.pdf |