NE LB169 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Approved by Governor on April 7, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Approved by Governor on April 7, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal locksmith registration requirements
Title
Repeal locksmith registration requirements
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Hansen [N] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 40-0-9 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 7, 2021 |
2021-04-01 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 1, 2021 |
2021-04-01 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2021-04-01 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 40-0-9 |
2021-03-24 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2021-03-22 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2021-03-16 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2021-03-10 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2021-02-10 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2021-01-15 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 25, 2021 |
2021-01-12 | Legislature | Referred to Business and Labor Committee |
2021-01-08 | Legislature | Brewer name added |
2021-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |