NE LB49 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-25 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-25 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for allied school systems
Title
Provide for allied school systems
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Scheer [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-25 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2015-01-20 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 27, 2015 |
2015-01-12 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2015-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |