NE LB71 | 2024 | 108th Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on August 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-20 - Indefinitely Postponed pursuant to Rule 9, Sec. 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on August 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-20 - Indefinitely Postponed pursuant to Rule 9, Sec. 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Nebraska Cannabis Legalization and Revenue Allocation Act and the Cannabis Conviction Relief Act
Title
Adopt the Nebraska Cannabis Legalization and Revenue Allocation Act and the Cannabis Conviction Relief Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely Postponed pursuant to Rule 9, Sec. 8 |
2024-08-07 | Legislature | Conrad MO101 Place on General File pursuant to Rule 9, Sec. 5 filed |
2024-07-31 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for August 02, 2024 |
2024-07-30 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2024-07-29 | Legislature | Date of introduction |