NE LB765 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB765 amended into LB873 by AM2065
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB765 amended into LB873 by AM2065
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to cities of the first class as prescribed
Title
Change provisions relating to cities of the first class as prescribed
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB765 amended into LB873 by AM2065 |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-26 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2018-01-09 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 16, 2018 |
2018-01-08 | Legislature | Referred to Urban Affairs Committee |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=33849 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB765.pdf |