NE LB784 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB784 amended into LB953 by AM2762
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB784 amended into LB953 by AM2762
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change the Employee Classification Act to prohibit contractors with unpaid fines from contracting with the state or political subdivisions
Title
Change the Employee Classification Act to prohibit contractors with unpaid fines from contracting with the state or political subdivisions
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Vargas [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB784 amended into LB953 by AM2762 |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-02-14 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2018-01-09 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 22, 2018 |
2018-01-08 | Legislature | Referred to Business and Labor Committee |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=34258 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB784.pdf |