NE LB811 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB811 amended into LB773 by AM2367
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB811 amended into LB773 by AM2367
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change prohibited uses of scanning devices and encoding machines
Title
Change prohibited uses of scanning devices and encoding machines
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB811 amended into LB773 by AM2367 |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-03-08 | Legislature | Judiciary AM2216 filed |
2018-03-08 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2216 |
2018-01-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 21, 2018 |
2018-01-08 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2018-01-04 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=34026 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB811.pdf |