NE LB822 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB822 amended into LB1008 by AM2292
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB822 amended into LB1008 by AM2292
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to the Department of Natural Resources
Title
Change provisions relating to the Department of Natural Resources
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Hughes [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB822 amended into LB1008 by AM2292 |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-02-28 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 07, 2018, on AM2191 |
2018-02-28 | Legislature | Hughes AM2191 filed |
2018-01-10 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 18, 2018 |
2018-01-08 | Legislature | Referred to Natural Resources Committee |
2018-01-04 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=34411 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB822.pdf |