NE LB842 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to affordable housing under the Municipal Density and Missing Middle Housing Act, the Nebraska Affordable Housing Act, and the Nebraska Housing Agency Act
Title
Change provisions relating to affordable housing under the Municipal Density and Missing Middle Housing Act, the Nebraska Affordable Housing Act, and the Nebraska Housing Agency Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-03-05 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM2778 filed |
2024-03-05 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2778 |
2024-01-17 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 30, 2024 |
2024-01-05 | Legislature | Referred to Urban Affairs Committee |
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Date of introduction |