NE LR160 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-22 - Notice of hearing for September 27, 2019
Pending: Legislature Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-22 - Notice of hearing for September 27, 2019
Pending: Legislature Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to assess the mental and behavioral health needs of Nebraskans and the current shortages of services and resources
Title
Interim study to assess the mental and behavioral health needs of Nebraskans and the current shortages of services and resources
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Howard [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-22 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for September 27, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=39869 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LR160.pdf |