NE LR430 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-25 - Notice of hearing for October 19, 2018
Pending: Legislature Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-25 - Notice of hearing for October 19, 2018
Pending: Legislature Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to examine the federal Family First Prevention Services Act of 2017 and its implementation in Nebraska
Title
Interim study to examine the federal Family First Prevention Services Act of 2017 and its implementation in Nebraska
Sponsors
Sen. Kate Bolz [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for October 19, 2018 |
2018-04-04 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2018-03-27 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2018-03-27 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=36291 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LR430.pdf |