NH HB1168 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-27 - Signed by the Governor on 6/16/2014; Chapter 0123; Effective 8/15/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-27 - Signed by the Governor on 6/16/2014; Chapter 0123; Effective 8/15/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to employer documentation of worker eligibility to work in the United States.
Title
Relative to employer documentation of worker eligibility to work in the United States.
Sponsors
Rep. Harold Rice [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-27 | House | Signed by the Governor on 6/16/2014; Chapter 0123; Effective 8/15/2014 |
2014-05-28 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 5/15/14) |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-05-14 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1613s (Rep A. White); Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1613s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 12 |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1613s Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1613s, 5/8/14; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Hearing: 4/10/14, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 2:20 p.m.; Senate Calendar 13 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce |
2014-02-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0116h Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-06 | House | Adopt Amendment #0116h Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-01-28 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0116h for Feb 5 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 7 |
2014-01-16 | House | Executive Session: 1/21/2014 2:15 PM Legislative Office Building 307 |
2014-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 1/14/2014 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2013-12-13 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services |