NH HB1185 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-09-11 - Executive Session: 10/03/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
Hearing: Oct 3 @ 10:00 am in Legislative Office Building 205-207
Hearing: Oct 3 @ 10:30 am in Legislative Office Building 205-207
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-09-11 - Executive Session: 10/03/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
Hearing: Oct 3 @ 10:00 am in Legislative Office Building 205-207
Hearing: Oct 3 @ 10:30 am in Legislative Office Building 205-207
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to sexual education instruction.
Title
Relative to sexual education instruction.
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Reid [R] | Rep. Carroll Brown [R] | Rep. John Sellers [R] | Rep. Sheila Seidel [R] |
Rep. Lisa Mazur [R] | Rep. Riche Colcombe [R] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Sen. Keith Murphy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-11 | House | Executive Session: 10/03/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-09-11 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 10/03/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-03-07 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2024 House Journal 7 P. 9 |
2024-02-20 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study 02/13/2024 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 6 |
2024-02-05 | House | Executive Session: 02/13/2024 09:45 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-01-31 | House | Public Hearing: 02/05/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-12-01 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Education |