NH HB1252 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to political contributions made by certain business entities.
Title
Relative to political contributions made by certain business entities.
Sponsors
Rep. David Love [R] | Rep. John Potucek [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5 |
2022-03-01 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-02-10 | House | Executive Session: 02/10/2022 1:00 p.m. Legislative Office Building306-308 |
2022-01-13 | House | Public Hearing: 01/19/2022 09:45 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2021-11-18 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Election Law |