NH HB1259 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on November 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Lay HB 1259 on Table (Rep. Steven Smith): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 195-126 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 48
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Lay HB 1259 on Table (Rep. Steven Smith): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 195-126 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 48
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to passenger restraints.
Title
Relative to passenger restraints.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Mulligan [D] | Rep. Timothy Horrigan [D] | Rep. Kate Murray [D] | Rep. David Doherty [D] |
Rep. Charlotte DiLorenzo [D] | Rep. Richard Abel [D] | Sen. Martha Hennessey [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - House - Table (Y: 195 N: 126 NV: 28 Abs: 43) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | House | Lay HB 1259 on Table (Rep. Steven Smith): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 195-126 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 48 |
2018-03-08 | House | Special Order to 3/15/2018 Without Objection House Journal 7 P. 49 |
2018-03-08 | House | Suspend House Rule 65 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by necessary two-thirds vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 125 |
2018-02-28 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2018-02-28 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 10-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 65 |
2018-02-28 | House | Executive Session: 02/27/2018 Legislative Office Building 203 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 02/06/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2017-11-07 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Transportation House Journal 1 P. 4 |