NH HB1259 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on November 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the election and resignation of members of school boards and elected budget committees.
Title
Relative to the election and resignation of members of school boards and elected budget committees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6 |
2022-03-09 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-02-28 | House | Executive Session: 02/28/2022 9:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building301-303 |
2022-02-07 | House | Public Hearing: 02/07/2022 11:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building301-303 |
2021-11-19 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Municipal and County Government |