NH HB1311 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-30 - House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2024-1945s (Rep. Ladd): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/30/2024 House Journal 15 P. 25
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-30 - House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2024-1945s (Rep. Ladd): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/30/2024 House Journal 15 P. 25
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to school district collection development and reconsideration policies.
Title
Relative to school district collection development and reconsideration policies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-14 - House - Reconsider (Y: 183 N: 192 NV: 6 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2024-03-14 - House - OTP (Y: 194 N: 180 NV: 9 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - House - Indefinitely Postpone (Y: 185 N: 190 NV: 8 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2024-03-14 - House - OTP (Y: 194 N: 180 NV: 9 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - House - Indefinitely Postpone (Y: 185 N: 190 NV: 8 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-30 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2024-1945s (Rep. Ladd): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/30/2024 House Journal 15 P. 25 |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1945s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/22/2024; Senate Journal 14 |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-1945s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/22/2024; Senate Journal 14 |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1945s, 05/22/2024, Vote 3-2; Senate Calendar 20 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | ==RECONVENE== Hearing: 05/07/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 18 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | ==RECESSED== Hearing: 04/30/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:20 am; Senate Calendar 17 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-14 | House | Reconsider HB1311 (Rep. Weber): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 183-192 03/14/2024 House Journal 8 P. 55 |
2024-03-14 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 194-180 03/14/2024 House Journal 8 P. 35 |
2024-03-14 | House | Indefinitely Postpone (Rep. Sweeney): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 185-190 03/14/2024 House Journal 8 P. 33 |
2024-02-29 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation 02/20/2024 (Vote 10-10; Regular Calendar) |
2024-02-15 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/20/2024 09:15 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-01-31 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/07/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-01-25 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 01/31/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-01-25 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 01/30/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 01/29/2024 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-12-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 15 |