NH HB1328 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-28 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-28 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing a utility to petition to be relieved of their carrier of last resort obligations.
Title
Authorizing a utility to petition to be relieved of their carrier of last resort obligations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-28 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 04/28/2022; Senate Calendar 17 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Hearing: 03/29/2022, Room 103, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 13 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Introduced 03/17/2022 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-17 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 173-138 03/17/2022 House Journal 8 |
2022-03-17 | House | Lay HB1328 on Table (Rep. Somssich): Motion Failed DV 142-168 03/17/2022 House Journal 8 |
2022-03-07 | House | Minority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study |
2022-03-07 | House | Majoritiy Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 12-9; Regular Calendar) |
2022-02-28 | House | Executive Session: 02/28/2022 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308 |
2022-02-01 | House | Public Hearing: 02/01/2022 2:30 p.m. Legislative Office Building306-308 |
2021-11-20 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy |