NH HB1370 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/05/2016; Senate Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/05/2016; Senate Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to termination of tenancy.
Title
Relative to termination of tenancy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-05 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/05/2016; Senate Journal 16 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 05/05/2016; Senate Calendar 17 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Hearing: 04/26/2016, Room 100, State House, 08:40 am; Senate Calendar 16 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Introduced 03/17/2016 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 10 |
2016-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0433h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2016 House Journal 25 P. 93 |
2016-03-11 | House | Amendment #2016-0433h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2016 House Journal 25 P. 93 |
2016-03-09 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Abramson) 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 2 |
2016-02-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0433h for 03/09/2016 (Vote 10-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 25 |
2016-02-25 | House | Executive Session: 02/17/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2016-01-20 | House | Public Hearing: 01/26/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 4 P. 12 |