NH HB1390 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on December 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate Motion Adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate Motion Adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Gold Star and Blue Star Mothers Service Flags and the Silver Star Service Flag.
Title
Relative to Gold Star and Blue Star Mothers Service Flags and the Silver Star Service Flag.
Sponsors
Rep. Alfred Baldasaro [R] | Rep. Leon Rideout [R] | Sen. Sam Cataldo [R] | Rep. Donald LeBrun [R] |
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-01-28 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 5 (Vote 12-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 7 |
2014-01-16 | House | Executive Session: 1/23/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2014-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 1/16/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2013-12-16 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs |