NH HB1592 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 04/14/2022; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 04/14/2022; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allowing parties in family court cases to create their own recordings of the proceedings.
Title
Allowing parties in family court cases to create their own recordings of the proceedings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-14 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 04/14/2022; Senate Journal 8 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 04/14/2022; Senate Calendar 15 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Hearing: 04/05/2022, Room 100, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 14 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Introduced 03/17/2022 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-16 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0474h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6 |
2022-03-16 | House | Amendment # 2022-0474h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6 |
2022-03-04 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0474h (Vote 19-1; Consent Calendar) |
2022-03-04 | House | Executive Session: 01/13/2022 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2022-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 01/13/2022 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2021-12-21 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Judiciary |