NH HB1592 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-28 - Lay HB1592 on Table (Rep. Sweeney): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 191-186 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 P. 129
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-28 - Lay HB1592 on Table (Rep. Sweeney): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 191-186 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 P. 129
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the use of education freedom account funds in religious schools.
Title
Relative to the use of education freedom account funds in religious schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - House - Table (Y: 191 N: 186 NV: 5 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | House | Lay HB1592 on Table (Rep. Sweeney): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 191-186 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 P. 129 |
2024-03-20 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation 03/06/2024 (Vote 10-10; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 27 |
2024-02-22 | House | Executive Session: 03/06/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-02-21 | House | Public Hearing: 03/04/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-12-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Education House Journal 1 |