NH HB1594 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-31 - Interim Study Report: Recommended For Future Legislation (Vote 14-9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-31 - Interim Study Report: Recommended For Future Legislation (Vote 14-9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring licensure of community association property managers.
Title
Requiring licensure of community association property managers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-31 | House | Interim Study Report: Recommended For Future Legislation (Vote 14-9) |
2014-09-16 | House | Executive Session: 10/22/2014 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2014-09-11 | House | Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/7/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 212 |
2014-09-10 | House | Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/30/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 212 |
2014-09-10 | House | ===CANCELLED=== Work Session: 9/23/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 212 |
2014-08-26 | House | Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/23/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 212 |
2014-06-05 | House | Refer to Interim Study (Finance) |
2014-02-12 | House | Refer to Interim Study Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-10 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0211h |
2014-02-10 | House | Majority Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Feb 19 (Vote 11-7; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 9 |
2014-01-30 | House | Executive Session: 2/04/2014 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306=CONTINUED= |
2014-01-16 | House | Executive Session: 1/21/2014 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306=Recessed= |
2014-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 1/14/2014 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-12-17 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration |