NH HB1631 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-17 - Signed by the Governor on 7/11/2014; Chapter 0186, Section 5 Effective 7/1/2015; Remainder Effective 1/1/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-17 - Signed by the Governor on 7/11/2014; Chapter 0186, Section 5 Effective 7/1/2015; Remainder Effective 1/1/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to debt collection and small claims.
Title
Relative to debt collection and small claims.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-17 | House | Signed by the Governor on 7/11/2014; Chapter 0186, Section 5 Effective 7/1/2015; Remainder Effective 1/1/2015. |
2014-05-15 | House | Enrolled |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-05-07 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1404s (Rep. Marjorie Smith) Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1404s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 10 |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1404s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1404s, 4/24/14; Senate Calendar 15 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Hearing: 4/8/14, Room 100, State House, 10:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 12 |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Introduced 3/13/14 and Referred to Judiciary |
2014-03-19 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0428h Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-19 | House | Adopt Amendment #2014-0428h Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-20 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0428h (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 19 |
2014-02-05 | House | Executive Session: 2/18/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2014-02-04 | House | ==Cancelled==Executive Session: 2/13/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2014-01-21 | House | Public Hearing: 1/30/2014 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2014-01-07 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Judiciary |